TN HR0035 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ray Goad
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize Ray Goad on the occasion of his retirement as secretary-treasurer of the Tri-County Electric Board of Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-12 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/12/21 |
2021-04-07 | House | Filed for introduction |