TN HR0034 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mamie Turner, Bullets Have No Eyes
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Mamie Turner and the Bullets Have No Eyes program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-03-16 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-13 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed for introduction |