TN HR0030 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-23)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-23)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National Medal of Honor Day, March 25, 2021
Title
A RESOLUTION to commemorate National Medal of Honor Day on March 25, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-25 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/21 |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed for introduction |