TN HR0023 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Speaker of the House of Representatives to appoint a committee to meet with a like committee from the Senate to consider the removal of Ellen Hobbs Lyle from the office of Chancellor of the Twentieth Judicial District by the Tennessee General Assembly acting pursuant to Article VI, Section 6 of the Constitution of Tennessee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to authorize the Speaker of the House of Representatives to appoint a committee to meet with a like committee from the Senate to consider the removal of Ellen Hobbs Lyle from the office of Chancellor of the Twentieth Judicial District by the Tennessee General Assembly acting pursuant to Article VI, Section 6 of the Constitution of Tennessee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseFailed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseIntro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback