TN HR0020 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

President Ronald Reagan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

President Ronald Reagan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 77, Nays 14, PNV 2
2019-03-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3-14-19
2019-02-28HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-4-19
2019-02-27HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback