TN HR0017 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Brian Harris
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Brian Harris for his work with Tennessee Right to Life.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Held on desk |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/8/2021 |
2021-02-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/11/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HR0017&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HR0017.pdf |