TN HR0014 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Approves amendments and revisions to the rules of criminal procedure, promulgated by the supreme court of Tennessee.
Title
Approves amendments and revisions to the rules of criminal procedure, promulgated by the supreme court of Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-03-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-03-19 | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-03-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/09 | |
2009-03-16 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2009-03-10 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HR0014&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HR0014.pdf |