TN HR0005 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tennessee recycling industry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the Tennessee recycling industry and the members of the Tennessee Scrap Recyclers Association and the Institute of Scrap Recycling Industries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-02-10HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-02-08HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2021
2021-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback