TN HR0003 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-21 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Charles Geesling

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor Charles Geesling, legendary bluegrass musician of the Upper Cumberland Region.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-01-21HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-01-21HouseAdopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-01-20HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/21/2023
2023-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback