TN HJR9014 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Alishia Fayth Layne
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Alishia Fayth Layne upon her recent achievement at the ISSF Junior World Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-11-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 10/29/2021 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-10-29 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2021-10-28 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 10/29/21 |
2021-10-28 | House | Filed for introduction |