TN HJR9004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

National Domestic Violence Awareness Month

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commemorate National Domestic Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10 Signed by Governor.
2021-11-01HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-11-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-11-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-11-01HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-10-29SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-10-29SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-10-29SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/29/2021
2021-10-28HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-10-28HouseAdopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-10-27HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 10/28/21
2021-10-26HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback