TN HJR8017 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-24)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Breast cancer awareness and Real Men Wear Pink

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize breast cancer awareness and the American Cancer Society's Real Men Wear Pink campaign.

Sponsors

Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]
Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]
Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]
Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]
Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]
Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Greg Vital [R]
Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26 Signed by Governor.
2021-10-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-10-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-10-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-10-21HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-10-20SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-10-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 10/20/2021
2021-10-20HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-10-20HouseAdopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-10-19HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 10/20/21
2021-10-19HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback