TN HJR8014 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Connor Henson, Columbia Academy, TSSAA Division II-A Cross Country State Champion
Title
A RESOLUTION to congratulate Connor Alexander Henson, 2021 TSSAA Division II-A State Track and Field champion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-10-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-10-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-10-21 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-10-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-20 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 10/20/21 |
2021-10-19 | House | Filed for introduction |