TN HJR8009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-26)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Representative Jim Coley

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the life and memory of Representative Jim Coley of Bartlett.

Sponsors

Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]
Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Michele Carringer [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]
Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Greg Vital [R]
Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26 Signed by Governor.
2021-10-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-10-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-10-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-10-21HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-10-20SenateConcurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2021-10-19SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/20/2021
2021-10-19SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-10-19SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-10-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-10-18HouseR/S Intro., adopted v.v.
2021-10-18HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback