TN HJR7002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Sarah Fuller, Vanderbilt University

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Sarah Fuller of Vanderbilt University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02 Signed by Governor.
2021-01-26HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-01-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-01-21SenateRules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote
2021-01-20HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-01-20HouseAdopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-01-19HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/20/2021
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback