TN HJR7001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mary Hance
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize Mary Hance on the occasion of her retirement from the Tennessean.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-01-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-01-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-01-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote |
2021-01-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-01-20 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/20/2021 |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |