TN HJR1387 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-24)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Grady Pascal Williams

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Grady Pascal Williams of Signal Mountain.

Sponsors

Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Greg Martin [R]
Rep. Greg Vital [R]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]
Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D]
Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Bryan Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2022-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2022-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2022-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-05-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2022-05-02SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2022-04-28SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2022-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/28/2022
2022-04-28SenateRefer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2022-04-27HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2022-04-27HouseAdopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2022-04-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2022-04-27HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/27/22
2022-04-27HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback