TN HJR1229 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
General James Norman Mattis, United States Marine Corps (ret.)
Title
General James Norman Mattis, United States Marine Corps (ret.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2020-06-16 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/20 |
2020-06-15 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-11 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 6/15/20 |
2020-06-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR1229&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR1229.pdf |