TN HJR1203 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Taiwan's response to COVID-19
Title
Taiwan's response to COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-10 | House | Adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 3, PNV 2 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/10/20 |
2020-06-09 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-08 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 6/9/20 |
2020-06-08 | House | Filed for introduction |