TN HJR1194 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Eugene Francis Nolan
Title
Eugene Francis Nolan
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-16 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2018-04-12 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/16/18 |
2018-04-12 | House | Filed for intro. |