TN HJR1179 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Representative Karen Camper, Women of Excellence.
Title
Representative Karen Camper, Women of Excellence.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-17 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0 |
2014-04-17 | House | All added as Sponsors |
2014-04-16 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/14 |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed for intro. |