TN HJR1091 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Donnie Smith, UT board of trustees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Donnie Smith, UT board of trustees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-24SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-23SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-19HouseAdopted, Ayes 83, Nays 2, PNV 4
2018-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17HouseReset on cal. for 4/18/2018
2018-04-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-09HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2018
2018-04-09HouseIntro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2018-04-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-09HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback