TN HJR1084 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William E. Evans, UT board of trustees
Title
William E. Evans, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 85, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Filed for intro. |