TN HJR1083 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-25)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-25)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Wendy Moten
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor musical artist Wendy Moten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2022-04-04 | House | Filed for introduction |