TN HJR1083 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
John C. Compton, UT board of trustees
Title
John C. Compton, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 65 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 65 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 1 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Filed for intro. |