TN HJR1080 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Summertown High School Lady Eagles, 2018 TSSAA Class A State Runner-Up
Title
Summertown High School Lady Eagles, 2018 TSSAA Class A State Runner-Up
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Adopted, Ayes 73, Nays 0, PNV 17 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-05 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4-9-18 |
2018-04-05 | House | Filed for intro. |