TN HJR1068 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-17)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Rick Shepard

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rick Shepard

Sponsors

Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Harry Brooks [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Barry Doss [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R]
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. John Forgety [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Brenda Gilmore [D]Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Beth Harwell [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Ron Lollar [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Judd Matheny [R]Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R]
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Joe Pitts [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Eddie Smith [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]Rep. James Van Huss [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Dawn White [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-19HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-18SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-16SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-11SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-05HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-05HouseAll Ayes added as Sponsors
2018-04-05HouseAdopted, Ayes 78, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-04HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4-5-18
2018-04-04HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback