TN HJR1035 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Steve Peterson
Title
Steve Peterson
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-18 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/19/20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Filed for introduction |