TN HJR1023 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Parental Alienation Awareness Day
Title
A RESOLUTION to commemorate April 25, 2022, as Parental Alienation Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-31 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/31/22 |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed for introduction |