TN HJR1022 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
John Hie, Tennessee Public Utility Commission
Title
John Hie, Tennessee Public Utility Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Intro., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Filed for intro. |