TN HJR1003 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for public education.
Title
Expresses support for public education.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. John Forgety [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY DUNN MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY DUNN MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1324) |
2018-04-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-25 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1302) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1300) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-04-18 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-17 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Failed in Delayed Bill Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-27 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2018-03-27 | House | Filed for intro. |