TN HJR0995 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dyersburg City Schools, Exemplary School District
Title
A RESOLUTION to congratulate Dyersburg City Schools on being named a 2022-2023 Exemplary School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-07 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |