TN HJR0992 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"John M. Stone, Sr., Highway," segment of U.S. Highway 70 in Metropolitan Nashville and Davidson County.
Title
"John M. Stone, Sr., Highway," segment of U.S. Highway 70 in Metropolitan Nashville and Davidson County.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben West [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-07 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-04 | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 6/3/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-05-20 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-20 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-20 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1551) | |
2010-05-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/20/10 | |
2010-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. for pass; ref to Transportation Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2010-03-31 | Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Filed for intro. |