TN HJR0979 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans Awareness Day, March 26, 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Awareness Day, March 26, 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-09HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2020-03-06HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/9/20
2020-03-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback