TN HJR0959 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requires TBR and UT institutions to accommodate non-traditional students seeking to complete degrees by accepting completed coursework and credits to the extent consistent with the school's academic standards.
Title
Requires TBR and UT institutions to accommodate non-traditional students seeking to complete degrees by accepting completed coursework and credits to the extent consistent with the school's academic standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-25 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-24 | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-05-13 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-05-10 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-10 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/10/2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Intro., ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Filed for intro. |