TN HJR0933 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Naomi M. Jerkins, 80th birthday.
Title
Naomi M. Jerkins, 80th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2014-04-07 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-03 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2014-04-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0933&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HJR0933.pdf |