TN HJR0920 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Business Education Partnership Foundation of Rutherford County
Title
Business Education Partnership Foundation of Rutherford County
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/15/18 |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed for intro. |