TN HJR0915 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Representative Craig Fitzhugh
Title
Representative Craig Fitzhugh
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-26 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2018-03-07 | House | Filed for intro. |