TN HJR0884 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Deep-Vein Thrombosis Awareness Month," March 2010
Title
"Deep-Vein Thrombosis Awareness Month," March 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-03-30 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-30 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-29 | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 1 | |
2010-03-09 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/11/10 | |
2010-03-04 | Filed for intro. |