TN HJR0878 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Representative Mark Pody
Title
Representative Mark Pody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-28 | House | Filed for intro. |