TN HJR0812 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2020
Title
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |