TN HJR0809 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the United States Congress to convene an Article V Convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that would restore the public's trust in our representative government by reforming our campaign finance system.
Title
Requests the United States Congress to convene an Article V Convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that would restore the public's trust in our representative government by reforming our campaign finance system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO REJECT (Y: 25 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 34 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 34 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Motion to reject failed, Ayes 25, Nays 65 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/10/20 |
2020-06-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-06-08 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 14, Nays 77, PNV 5 |
2020-06-02 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/8/2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |