TN HJR0782 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Charles H. Coolidge National Medal of Honor Heritage Center
Title
Charles H. Coolidge National Medal of Honor Heritage Center
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-02-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-02-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 2/6/2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-03 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-3-20 |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |