TN HJR0766 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 833
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 833
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lauren Smith, Public Charter School Commission
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Lauren Smith to the Public Charter School Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 833 |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0766&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HJR0766.pdf |