TN HJR0751 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Department of Agriculture, Mississippi River/Gulf of Mexico Watershed Nutrient Task Force
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the Tennessee Department of Agriculture upon its exemplary work on the Mississippi River/Gulf of Mexico Watershed Nutrient Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-02-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-02-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-02-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-03 | House | Adopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/3/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |