TN HJR0744 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to preserve the independence of the United States Supreme Court by amending the United States Constitution to require the United States Supreme Court to be composed of no more than nine members.
Title
Urges Congress to preserve the independence of the United States Supreme Court by amending the United States Constitution to require the United States Supreme Court to be composed of no more than nine members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |