TN HJR0741 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Affirms the constitutional duty and exclusive authority and power of the General Assembly to appropriate public moneys and balance the state budget.
Title
Affirms the constitutional duty and exclusive authority and power of the General Assembly to appropriate public moneys and balance the state budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-02 | House | Adopted, Ayes 72, Nays 25, PNV 2 |
2020-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |