TN HJR0740 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week of February 28, 2022, as "Tennessee Music Therapy Week."
Title
A RESOLUTION designating the week of February 28, 2022, as "Tennessee Music Therapy Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-28 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/22 |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/1/2022 |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming & Designating |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |