TN HJR0734 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR545
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR545
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Robert S. Eby, State Board of Education
Title
Robert S. Eby, State Board of Education
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR545 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0734&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0734.pdf |