TN HJR0713 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for a minimum mandatory school nurse to student ratio of 1:750, encourages LEAs to access grants to fund school nurses, and encourages school nurses to work in collaboration with other health care professionals.
Title
Expresses support for a minimum mandatory school nurse to student ratio of 1:750, encourages LEAs to access grants to fund school nurses, and encourages school nurses to work in collaboration with other health care professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |